Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1199 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19002 Week
» 72018 Month
» 191545 Year
» 3218398 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1263 |
m/e |
02/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4263 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8862 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68862 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
227 |
Works Number |
956 |
To Service |
During 02/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 13/10/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1902 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
4w/e |
13/09/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
13/10/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/10/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1955 |
London Transport |
No. 68862, a G.N.R. saddle tank, recently arrived at Neasden from the Eastern Region and is stored in the siding behind the running shed. |
SLS/195601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1263 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 956 |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4263 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8862 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68862 |
|
|
13/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68862 |
|
|