|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1960 | Ardsley MPD | J94s 68008/11/5/45 have been transferred for working the E & W Yorkshire Union branch from Lofthouse in place of J52s 68869/75 which have been placed in store-the last two in main line stock. | SLS/196103 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1270 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 963 |
||
12/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4270 | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8869 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) | ||
11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68869 | ||
13/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) | ||
11/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
20/03/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68869 |