Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2169 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19972 Week
» 72988 Month
» 192515 Year
» 3219368 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
978 |
m/e |
06/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3978 |
m/e |
11/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8780 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68780 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
682 |
To Service |
During 06/1895 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 25/01/1954 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1895 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
35B |
|
Grantham |
3w/e |
28/07/1951 |
35B |
|
Grantham |
4w/e |
18/08/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
25/01/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35B |
Grantham |
3w/e |
28/07/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
25/01/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 978 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 682 |
|
|
11/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3978 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8780 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68780 |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
18/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
25/01/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68780 |
|
|