Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17937 Week
» 70953 Month
» 190480 Year
» 3217333 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
155 |
m/e |
02/1889 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7155 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8211 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
68211 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J65 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
E22 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 02/1889 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 23/11/1953 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1889 |
IPS |
|
Ipswich |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
YB |
|
Yarmouth Beach |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
IPS |
|
Ipswich |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
23/11/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
YB |
Yarmouth Beach |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/11/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1951 |
F4 travels |
No. 7155 F4 recently allocated Malton, withdrawn 14/8/51, spent two weeks at Neasden, before going to Stratford. Though not officially reported, it was renumbered 67155 at Stratford between 11/2/50 and 22/4/50. |
SLS/195110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1889 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 155 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7155 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8211 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68211 |
|
|
1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
23/11/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68211 |
|
|