Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 157 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17960 Week
» 70976 Month
» 190503 Year
» 3217356 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
250 |
m/e |
03/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7250 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8214 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68214 |
m/e |
08/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J65 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B32 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 03/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/10/1956 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1925 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 250 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7250 |
|
|
09/1925 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8214 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
28/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
16/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
08/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68214 |
|
|
13/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
22/10/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68214 |
|
|
1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|