Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 5078 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20690 Week
» 119335 Month
» 321999 Year
» 3348852 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
307 |
m/e |
06/1888 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7307 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8378 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68378 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Departmental |
36 |
m/e |
11/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J66 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H21 |
To Service |
During 06/1888 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1952 |
Service Life |
64 yrs , 3 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1888 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
STR |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
CAM |
|
Cambridge |
4w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
09/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
9w/e |
31/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
22/01/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1888 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 307 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7307 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8378 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68378 |
|
|
09/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68378 |
|
|
11/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 36 |
|
|