Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 364 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18167 Week
» 71183 Month
» 190710 Year
» 3217563 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
339 |
m/e |
05/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7339 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8501 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68501 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S24 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 16/08/1960 |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
15/06/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/08/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
10/1926 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
10/1926 |
Condensers removed |
10/1926 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 339 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7339 |
|
|
08/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
10/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8501 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68501 |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
16/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68501 |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|