Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 66 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17869 Week
» 70885 Month
» 190412 Year
» 3217265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
367 |
m/e |
04/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7367 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8543 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68543 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Departmental |
45 |
m/e |
11/1959 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
N33 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/11/1959 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1894 |
BOS |
|
Boston |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
4w/e |
15/06/1957 |
40A |
|
Lincoln |
5w/e |
14/06/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
15/06/1957 |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1929 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
08/1929 |
Condensers removed |
08/1929 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 367 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7367 |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8543 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68543 |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
11/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45 |
|
|
02/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|