|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1894 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 374 Built at Stratford Works |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7374 | ||
07/1928 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
07/1928 | Modification | Modification: Steam Brakes fitted | ||
07/1928 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8550 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
05/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68550 | ||
10/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
16/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
17/12/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
27/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
07/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
25/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68550 |