Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 704 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14110 Week
» 67126 Month
» 186653 Year
» 3213506 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
379 |
m/e |
10/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7379 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8555 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68555 |
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F36 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 10/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/05/1958 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1928 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
08/1928 |
Condensers removed |
08/1928 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/06/1958 |
Stratford MPD |
On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 379 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7379 |
|
|
08/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
08/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8555 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68555 |
|
|
17/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
20/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
05/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68555 |
|
|
08/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|