Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 642 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18445 Week
» 71461 Month
» 190988 Year
» 3217841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
393 |
m/e |
01/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7393 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8569 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68569 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
Y36 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 01/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 02/06/1960 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1929 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
12/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1929 |
Condensers removed |
12/1929 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 393 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7393 |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8569 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68569 |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
02/06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68569 |
|
|
07/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|