Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1579 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19382 Week
» 72398 Month
» 191925 Year
» 3218778 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
394 |
m/e |
01/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7394 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8570 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68570 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
Y36 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 01/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/09/1961 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
MEL |
|
on |
28/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
on |
15/12/1948 |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
4w/e |
19/03/1960 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
08/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1926 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
10/1926 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
10/1926 |
Condensers removed |
10/1926 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 394 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7394 |
|
|
10/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
10/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8570 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Melton Constable (MC) |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
28/11/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68570 |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68570 |
|
|