Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 209 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 15821 Week
» 114466 Month
» 317130 Year
» 3343983 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
270 |
m/e |
05/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7270 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8578 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68578 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
C37 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/01/1961 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
ALLOC |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
4w/e |
26/11/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
1947 |
Condenser fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1961 |
Stratford Works (Scrap Road) |
New Erecting Shop: D204, D5041/3/72/95, D5515/6/62, D5625, D5907, D8216, D8403/8. Outside New Erecting Shop: D206, D5050/1, D5588, D5634, D5905. Old Works: 43105, 64697, 65460/2, 67716, 69646, 69730. Old Works Yard: 65465, 67701, 68538, 69713. Scrap Road: 68578, 69656, Works Shunters : DEPT32/44/5. |
SLS/196106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 270 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7270 |
|
|
07/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8578 |
|
|
1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Condenser fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68578 |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68578 |
|
|
06/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|