Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 4259 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17665 Week
» 70681 Month
» 190208 Year
» 3217061 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
200 |
m/e |
12/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7200 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8606 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68606 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G47 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 07/03/1955 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
14/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 200 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7200 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8606 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68606 |
|
|
14/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
07/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68606 |
|
|
07/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|