Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2284 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20087 Week
» 73103 Month
» 192630 Year
» 3219483 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
206 |
m/e |
12/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7206 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8593 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68593 |
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G47 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/01/1958 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1899 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
IPS |
|
Ipswich |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/01/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/01/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 206 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7206 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8593 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68593 |
|
|
20/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68593 |
|
|
04/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|