|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Waiting Cut Up) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1901 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 169 Built at Stratford Works |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7169 | ||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
07/1936 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
10/1939 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8616 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) | ||
11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68616 | ||
30/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
09/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
19/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
22/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
12/11/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
27/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68616 | ||
01/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |