|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/09/1947 | Stratford Works | The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. | SLS/194711 |
29/06/1958 | Stratford MPD | On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. | SLS/195807 |
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Waiting Cut Up) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 86 Built at Stratford Works |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7086 | ||
12/1927 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
12/1927 | Modification | Modification: Steam Brakes fitted | ||
12/1927 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8632 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
07/1951 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68632 | ||
15/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
13/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
08/05/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68632 | ||
12/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |