Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3186 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16592 Week
» 69608 Month
» 189135 Year
» 3215988 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
128 |
m/e |
06/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7128 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8222 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68222 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J70 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
P75 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1914 |
Withdrawal |
During 01/1955 |
Service Life |
40 yrs , 7 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
KL |
Kings Lynn |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/02/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 128 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7128 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8222 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68222 |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
21/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
01/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68222 |
|
|
05/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|