Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 632 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1540 Week
» 12685 Month
» 112470 Year
» 1777846 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 400 m/e 07/1890
London and North Eastern Railway 8260 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 68260 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7107/1890
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 07/1890
Withdrawal Mon 07/03/1960
Service Life 69 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1890
MID   Middlesbrough on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51L   Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
51E   Stockton w/e 27/12/1958
     Withdrawn on 07/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 14/06/1959
WDN   on 07/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). SLS/194904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1890 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 400
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8260    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Middlesbrough (MID)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68260    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
07/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 68260    

prev prev