Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 344 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5063 Week
» 16208 Month
» 115993 Year
» 1781369 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 280 m/e 11/1891
London and North Eastern Railway 8273 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 68273 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7111/1891
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1891
Withdrawal Thu 14/11/1957
Service Life 66 yrs , 14 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1891
HTN   Heaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52C   Blaydon 5w/e 23/06/1951
50A   York (North) 5w/e 20/07/1957
     Withdrawn on 14/11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52C Blaydon w/e 23/06/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   on 25/11/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Darlington Works New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) SLS/194804

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1891 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 280
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8273    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68273    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
14/11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 68273    

prev prev