Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 257 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4976 Week
» 16121 Month
» 115906 Year
» 1781282 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 452 m/e 01/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8277 m/e 01/1947
British Railways 68277 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7101/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 01/1892
Withdrawal Sat 25/11/1950
Service Life 58 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1892
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 25/11/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 23/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Darlington Works New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) SLS/194804

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 452
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 8277    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 68277 but not taken up    
25/11/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 8277    

prev prev