Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 39 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4758 Week
» 15903 Month
» 115688 Year
» 1781064 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1103 m/e 02/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8281 on 03/02/1946
British Railways 68281 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7102/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 02/1892
Withdrawal Mon 23/11/1953
Service Life 61 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1892
DAR   Darlington on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51C   West Hartlepool w/e 15/09/1951
51C   West Hartlepool 5w/e 22/09/1951
53A   Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/06/1953
     Withdrawn on 23/11/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 13/06/1953
WDN   on 23/11/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/12/1953 Darlington Works North Road Works have completed 2MT 78010 an 78011 is ready for trials. Diesel shunters are out up to 13074, with the next four nearly completed. J2 65023 (fully lined out) and J5 65488, both from 38A, arrived here on 3rd December for cutting up. J77 68281 has also been cut up. SLS/195402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1103
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8281    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Darlington (DAR)    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68281    
15/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
23/11/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 68281    

prev prev