Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 529 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1437 Week
» 12582 Month
» 112367 Year
» 1777743 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1142 m/e 03/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8283 on 24/02/1946
British Railways 68283 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7103/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 03/1892
Withdrawal Thu 30/07/1959
Service Life 67 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1892
GHD   Gateshead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 30/07/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GHD Gateshead on 05/07/1947
WDN   on 30/07/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1142
Built at Darlington Works
   
24/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8283    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68283    
30/07/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 68283    

prev prev