Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 835 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14241 Week
» 67257 Month
» 186784 Year
» 3213637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1142 |
m/e |
03/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway |
8283 |
on |
24/02/1946 |
British Railways |
68283 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J71 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 03/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 30/07/1959 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1892 |
GHD |
|
Gateshead |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/07/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GHD |
Gateshead |
on |
05/07/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/07/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1142 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
24/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8283 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68283 |
|
|
30/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68283 |
|
|