Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 619 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1527 Week
» 12672 Month
» 112457 Year
» 1777833 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1153 m/e 03/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8284 on 10/02/1946
British Railways 68284 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7103/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 03/1892
Withdrawal Mon 10/10/1955
Service Life 63 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1892
BLA   Blaydon on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
TWD   Tweedmouth w/e 19/06/1948
53C   Hull Springhead 4w/e 24/10/1953
53A   Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/02/1954
     Withdrawn on 10/10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HEX   on 21/09/1947
ALLOC BLA Blaydon w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC TWD Tweedmouth w/e 19/06/1948
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 27/02/1954
WDN   on 10/10/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1153
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8284    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA)    
19/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68284    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
20/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
10/10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 68284    

prev prev