Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 42 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4761 Week
» 15906 Month
» 115691 Year
» 1781067 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1157 m/e 03/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8285 on 24/02/1946
British Railways 68285 on Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7103/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 03/1892
Withdrawal Mon 04/10/1948
Service Life 56 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1892
SEL   Selby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 04/10/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN SEL Selby on 04/10/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1157
Built at Darlington Works
   
24/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8285    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Selby (SEL)    
04/10/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 8285    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 68285 but not taken up    

prev prev