Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 295 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5014 Week
» 16159 Month
» 115944 Year
» 1781320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1084 m/e 07/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8288 on 10/02/1946
British Railways 68288 on Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7107/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 07/1892
Withdrawal Sat 25/11/1950
Service Life 58 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1892
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 25/11/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 20/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1084
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8288    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 68288 but not taken up    
25/11/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 8288    

prev prev