Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 42 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4761 Week
» 15906 Month
» 115691 Year
» 1781067 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1155 m/e 08/1892
London and North Eastern Railway 8292 on 03/02/1946
British Railways 68292 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7108/1892
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 08/1892
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/10/1954
Service Life 62 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1892
YK   York (North) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20D   Normanton 4w/e 29/12/1951
20D   Normanton 4w/e 26/01/1952
     Withdrawn w/e 16/10/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 20D Normanton w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 20D Normanton 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 20D Normanton 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   w/e 16/10/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902
31/10/1954 Darlington Works Darlington Works have completed Class '2' B.R. engines up to No. 78039 and withdrawal of old N.E.R. types has speeded up recently. Nos. 69770, 69385, 68258, 68292 (this engine had the extra hanging buffers for shunting the old cauldron wagons long since gone), 68304, 65661/7/86/705/10, and 62358/71/4/80/89. 62371 is of note as she is one of the 1942 rebuilt class''D20' engines, and also, in her early N.E. days as No. 592 she was stationed at Edinburgh, for working the East Coast trains to Newcastle, with Driver John Graham, who was later promoted to Night Running Foreman at Bank Top, Darlington. One thing peculiar to this engine was the absence of brass beading on the splasher above the rear driving wheels, which gave her an odd look. SLS/195412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1892 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1155
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8292    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68292    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (20D)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (20D)    
16/10/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 68292    

prev prev