Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2033 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15439 Week
» 68455 Month
» 187982 Year
» 3214835 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1197 |
m/e |
11/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway |
8294 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68294 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J71 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 11/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/11/1956 |
Service Life |
64 yrs , 10 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1892 |
YK |
|
York (North) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
20D |
|
Normanton |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
20D |
|
Normanton |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
10/11/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
20D |
Normanton |
w/e |
29/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
20D |
Normanton |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
20D |
Normanton |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/11/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1197 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8294 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68294 |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (20D) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (20D) |
|
|
10/11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68294 |
|
|