Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2498 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15904 Week
» 68920 Month
» 188447 Year
» 3215300 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
972 |
m/e |
01/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway |
8297 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68297 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J71 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 01/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/05/1956 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 4 mths , 25 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1893 |
YK |
|
York (North) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/05/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/05/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1948 |
Easingwold Railway |
This line now uses a York 'J.71' for a month at a time, No. 8246 was used during August and No. 8297 in September; their own 0-6-OST being still derelict at North Road Works. |
SLS/194811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1893 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 972 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8297 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68297 |
|
|
26/05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68297 |
|
|