Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 52 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4771 Week
» 15916 Month
» 115701 Year
» 1781077 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1689 m/e 10/1895
London and North Eastern Railway 8313 on 17/03/1946
British Railways 68313 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7110/1895
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 10/1895
Withdrawal w/e Mon 03/09/1956
Service Life 60 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1895
SEL   Selby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
YK   York (North) w/e 19/06/1948
     Withdrawn w/e 03/09/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 19/06/1948
WDN   w/e 03/09/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1895 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1689
Built at Darlington Works
   
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8313    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Selby (SEL)    
19/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68313    
03/09/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 68313    

prev prev