Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 43 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4762 Week
» 15907 Month
» 115692 Year
» 1781068 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1690 m/e 10/1895
London and North Eastern Railway 8314 on 17/03/1946
British Railways 68314 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7110/1895
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 10/1895
Withdrawal Thu 14/04/1960
Service Life 64 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1895
GHD   Gateshead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52D   Tweedmouth w/e 23/01/1960
     Withdrawn on 14/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52D Tweedmouth 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   on 09/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1895 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1690
Built at Darlington Works
   
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8314    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68314    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D)    
14/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 68314    

prev prev