Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 45 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4764 Week
» 15909 Month
» 115694 Year
» 1781070 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1864 m/e 11/1895
London and North Eastern Railway 8316 on 17/03/1946
British Railways 68316 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7111/1895
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1895
Withdrawal Fri 14/10/1960
Service Life 64 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1895
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
54C   Borough Gardens 4w/e 14/02/1953
51C   West Hartlepool w/e 20/06/1959
     Withdrawn on 14/10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 11/07/1959
WDN   on 14/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1961 Darlington Works (Scrap Yard, ii Parts of Locos) Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1895 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1864
Built at Darlington Works
   
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8316    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 68316    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
14/10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 68316    

prev