Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3103 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16509 Week
» 69525 Month
» 189052 Year
» 3215905 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1746 |
m/e |
12/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8677 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68677 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 12/1898 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/10/1961 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
w/e |
01/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/06/1949 |
Easingwold |
On 4/6, No. 68677 was noted shunting on the Easingwold Light Rly. at Alne. |
SLS/194908 |
26/08/1961 |
York South |
York south shed is now used for storage only-on 26th August the following were noted-47239/48, 61418/9/44/67, 68677/87, 69003/8/16. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1898 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1746 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8677 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68677 |
|
|
12/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
01/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
02/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68677 |
|
|