Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 93 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6020 Week
» 4758 Month
» 419079 Year
» 1640644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2181 m/e 09/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 8698 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 68698 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class J72
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 09/1914
Withdrawal Mon 02/10/1961
Service Life 47 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1914
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
50A York (North) 4w/e 21/09/1957
51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 19/07/1958
   Withdrawn on 02/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 14/07/1958
WDN   on 02/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/12/1948 Darlington Works Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103.
Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329.
SLS/194901
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1914 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2181
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8698    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68698    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
02/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 68698    

prev prev