Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 93 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6020 Week
» 4758 Month
» 419079 Year
» 1640644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2190 m/e 11/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 8707 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 68707 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class J72
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1914
Withdrawal Mon 02/04/1962
Service Life 47 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1914
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51F West Auckland 4w/e 20/09/1952
51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 25/05/1956
   Withdrawn on 02/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51A Darlington on 23/04/1950
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 26/05/1956
WDN   on 02/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1914 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2190
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8707    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 68707    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
25/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
02/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 68707    

prev prev