Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 331 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18134 Week
» 71150 Month
» 190677 Year
» 3217530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2319 |
m/e |
04/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8726 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68726 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Works Number |
397 |
To Service |
During 04/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 20/06/1961 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1922 |
YK |
|
York (North) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
55E |
|
Normanton |
4w/e |
08/03/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/06/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
55E |
Normanton |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/06/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1922 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2319 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 397 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8726 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68726 |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
20/06/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68726 |
|
|