Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 310 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18113 Week
» 71129 Month
» 190656 Year
» 3217509 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
550 |
m/e |
06/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8361 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68361 |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J73 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
To Service |
During 06/1892 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1960 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1892 |
HLA |
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
53C |
|
Hull Springhead |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
53A |
|
Hull Dairycoates |
w/e |
06/12/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
10/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 550 Built at Gateshead Works |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8361 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
17/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68361 |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
06/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68361 |
|
|