Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 93 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6020 Week
» 4758 Month
» 419079 Year
» 1640644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 75148 m/e 12/1944
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 8016 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 68016 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class J94
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
Works Number 3198
To Service During 12/1944
Withdrawal Mon 25/05/1964
Scrapping Cohens (South Bank, Middlesbrough)
Service Life 19 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1944
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52H Tyne Dock w/e 26/08/1961
52A Gateshead w/e 24/03/1962
52H Tyne Dock w/e 07/04/1962
51A Darlington w/e 26/01/1963
   Withdrawn on 25/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SUN Sunderland on 25/05/1947
ALLOC BOR Borough Gardens w/e 20/11/1948
ALLOC SUN Sunderland w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 4w/e 09/09/1961
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 3w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 09/02/1963
WDN   on 25/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1948 Extended bunker fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 75148
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd., Works Number 3198
   
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8016    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
12/1948 Modification Modification: Extended bunker fitted    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68016    
26/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
07/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
26/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
25/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 68016    

prev prev