Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 340 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6267 Week
» 5005 Month
» 419326 Year
» 1640891 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 75326 m/e 07/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 8041 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 68041 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class J94
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 5316
To Service During 07/1945
Withdrawal Mon 14/10/1963
Service Life 18 yrs, 3 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1945
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
54A Sunderland 5w/e 23/06/1951
51C West Hartlepool w/e 09/09/1961
   Withdrawn on 14/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52C Blaydon w/e 04/03/1950
ALLOC 54A Sunderland w/e 23/06/1951
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 09/09/1961
WDN   on 14/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 75326
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5316
   
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8041    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68041    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
14/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 68041    

prev prev