Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 93 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6020 Week
» 4758 Month
» 419079 Year
» 1640644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 75270 m/e 02/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 8058 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 68058 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class J94
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder W.G. Bagnall
Works Number 2793
To Service During 02/1946
Withdrawal Mon 29/10/1962
Service Life 16 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1946
BLA Blaydon on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
54A Sunderland 5w/e 23/06/1951
51C West Hartlepool w/e 09/09/1961
   Withdrawn on 29/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HEX   w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 52C Blaydon on 16/04/1950
ALLOC 54A Sunderland w/e 23/06/1951
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 09/09/1961
WDN   w/e 29/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1946 To Service To service as WD Number 75270
Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2793
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8058    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68058    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
29/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 68058    

prev prev