Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1577 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19380 Week
» 72396 Month
» 191923 Year
» 3218776 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
71463 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8078 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68078 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
5w/e |
08/04/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/03/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1949 |
Extended bunker fitted |
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 8078 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock, Works Number 2212 |
|
|
07/1946 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 71463 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock, Works Number 2212 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended bunker fitted |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68078 |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
10/03/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68078 |
|
|