Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 94 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6021 Week
» 4759 Month
» 419080 Year
» 1640645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 62006 on 15/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Peppercorn
Class K1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L982
Works Number 26610
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sun 15/06/1949 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Sun 04/09/1966 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During y/e 1967
Service Life 17 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Hughes Bolckow Blyth 12/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) on 15/06/1949
52C Blaydon on 31/01/1954
52A Gateshead on 06/05/1962
52B Heaton on 23/09/1962
52d Alnmouth on 04/11/1962
52G Sunderland on 19/06/1966
   Withdrawn on 04/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW DAR Darlington on 15/06/1949
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 5w/e 27/02/1954
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 02/06/1962
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 52Da   5w/e 10/11/1962
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 16/07/1966
WDN   on 04/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 19/12/1949 21/12/1949 3 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 13/07/1951 20/07/1951 8 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 23/10/1951 17/11/1951 26 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/09/1953 08/10/1953 35 days General  
Darlington Works 28/09/1954 06/10/1954 9 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 20/03/1955 23/03/1955 4 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 29/07/1955 29/08/1955 32 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/08/1956 17/08/1956 8 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 06/12/1956 19/12/1956 14 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 16/01/1957 18/01/1957 3 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 29/04/1957 09/05/1957 11 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 10/10/1957 08/11/1957 30 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/02/1959 10/03/1959 19 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 25/04/1959 13/05/1959 19 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 13/10/1959 07/11/1959 26 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/09/1961 13/10/1961 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/11/1962 05/12/1962 24 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 09/12/1963 13/12/1963 5 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1949 Queens Park Works Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 62004/05(10/6), 62006(15/6), 62007(17/6), 62008(21/6), 62009(23/6), 62010(27/6), 62011(29/6) and 62012(W/E 2/7). Works' Nos. checked are:-Nos. 62001-12(26605-16/49). SLS/194908
01/10/1961 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/06/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 62006
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26610
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
   
31/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
06/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
23/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
04/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d)    
19/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
04/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 62006 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev