Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 369 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6296 Week
» 5034 Month
» 419355 Year
» 1640920 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 62007 on 17/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Peppercorn
Class K1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L982
Works Number 26611
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sat 17/06/1949 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Sat 09/09/1967 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Scrapping During y/e 1967
Service Life 18 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Hughes Bolckow, Blyth 9/67

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) on 17/06/1949
HTN Heaton on 25/09/1949
51A Darlington on 06/07/1952
50A York (North) on 25/08/1963
55H Neville Hill on 28/06/1964
52G Sunderland on 03/10/1965
52H Tyne Dock on 23/10/1966
   Withdrawn on 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW DAR Darlington on 17/06/1949
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 55H Neville Hill 3w/e 04/07/1964
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 4w/e 05/11/1966
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 25/10/1949 14/11/1949 21 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 29/12/1949 04/01/1950 7 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 12/07/1951 09/08/1951 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/10/1952 05/11/1952 16 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 23/09/1953 19/10/1953 27 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/04/1954 28/04/1954 3 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 19/10/1954 23/10/1954 5 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 23/05/1956 21/06/1956 30 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/12/1957 09/12/1957 8 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 16/01/1959 06/02/1959 22 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 24/04/1959 28/05/1959 35 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/07/1960 21/07/1960 8 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 31/10/1961 29/11/1961 30 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/12/1962 21/12/1962 19 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 31/12/1964 03/03/1965 63 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 29/03/1965 06/04/1965 9 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1949 Queens Park Works Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 62004/05(10/6), 62006(15/6), 62007(17/6), 62008(21/6), 62009(23/6), 62010(27/6), 62011(29/6) and 62012(W/E 2/7). Works' Nos. checked are:-Nos. 62001-12(26605-16/49). SLS/194908
03/07/1949 Eastfield MPD On 3/7, new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's, Nos. 62005, 62007-12, were on the shed, and a number of ex L.N.E.R. locomotives were observed with the Power Classification painted on the cab sides. SLS/194908
10/01/1962 Doncaster MPD Ex-Works on Doncaster (36A) Shed: D3447, D5823 (new), 43160, 60525, 62007, 63969, 70000. SLS/196201
02/07/1967 Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Tyne Dock) Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). SLS/196708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/06/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 62007
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26611
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
   
25/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
06/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
25/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
28/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
03/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
23/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 62007 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev