|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1950 | 18/09/1950 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1950 | 22/11/1950 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1951 | 10/01/1952 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1953 | 15/01/1954 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1954 | 09/08/1954 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1955 | 12/05/1955 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1956 | 29/02/1956 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1958 | 19/06/1958 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1960 | 27/06/1960 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1962 | 23/11/1962 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1965 | 01/12/1965 | 37 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1949 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62012 (1/7),62013, 62014, 62015, 62016, 62017, 62018, 62019, 62020, 62021, 62022, 62023.62024, 62025, 62026, 62027, 62028, 62029, 62030, 62031, 62032, 62033 and 62034, while No. 62038 was 'road steamed' at the Works on 30/8. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62012/13 (26616/17/1949), 62015 (26619/1949), 62018/19 (26622/23/1949), 62022/23 (26626/27/1949), 62026-31 (26630-35/1949) and 62033/34 (26637/38/1949). | SLS/194910 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Others) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/07/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 62017 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26621 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) |
||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
24/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/08/1950. Dep: 18/09/1950. | ||
14/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/11/1950. Dep: 22/11/1950. | ||
12/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1951. Dep: 10/01/1952. | ||
17/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1953. Dep: 15/01/1954. | ||
23/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/07/1954. Dep: 09/08/1954. | ||
29/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1955. Dep: 12/05/1955. | ||
27/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1956. Dep: 29/02/1956. | ||
20/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1958. Dep: 19/06/1958. | ||
25/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1960. Dep: 27/06/1960. | ||
11/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
10/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1962. Dep: 23/11/1962. | ||
10/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
26/10/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1965. Dep: 01/12/1965. | ||
1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
20/02/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62017 from Blyth (North) (52F) |