|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1950 | 26/01/1950 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1950 | 20/10/1950 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1951 | 23/05/1951 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1952 | 03/06/1952 | 19 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1953 | 23/03/1953 | 25 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1954 | 03/09/1954 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1955 | 15/02/1955 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1956 | 26/03/1956 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1957 | 06/04/1957 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1959 | 07/04/1959 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1961 | 13/09/1961 | 36 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1949 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62012 (1/7),62013, 62014, 62015, 62016, 62017, 62018, 62019, 62020, 62021, 62022, 62023.62024, 62025, 62026, 62027, 62028, 62029, 62030, 62031, 62032, 62033 and 62034, while No. 62038 was 'road steamed' at the Works on 30/8. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 62012/13 (26616/17/1949), 62015 (26619/1949), 62018/19 (26622/23/1949), 62022/23 (26626/27/1949), 62026-31 (26630-35/1949) and 62033/34 (26637/38/1949). | SLS/194910 |
23/01/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Waiting works or stored) | Waiting works or stored: 60114/28/57/8, 61212, 62020/33/7/40/51/5/66, 63606/728/906, 90042/469, 92169/70/5/92/8/9. | SLS/196503 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/08/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 62033 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26637 Allocated to March (MAR) |
||
24/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/01/1950. Dep: 26/01/1950. | ||
16/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1950. Dep: 20/10/1950. | ||
24/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1951. Dep: 23/05/1951. | ||
16/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/05/1952. Dep: 03/06/1952. | ||
27/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1953. Dep: 23/03/1953. | ||
24/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/08/1954. Dep: 03/09/1954. | ||
18/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1955. Dep: 15/02/1955. | ||
13/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/03/1956. Dep: 26/03/1956. | ||
09/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957. | ||
03/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1959. Dep: 07/04/1959. | ||
18/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
09/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1961. Dep: 13/09/1961. | ||
1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
10/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62033 from Frodingham (36C) |