|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1922 | 11/11/1922 | 129 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1923 | 21/04/1923 | 6 days | Light Repair | New chimney to G E gauge |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1923 | 15/03/1924 | 102 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4630 |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1926 | 29/01/1927 | 97 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1929 | 16/11/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1932 | 15/10/1932 | 50 days | General | Rebuilt to K2 |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1934 | 08/09/1934 | 67 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1936 | 16/05/1936 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1938 | 05/02/1938 | 15 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1939 | 27/01/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1943 | 30/01/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/04/1945 | 07/05/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/05/1947 | 03/09/1947 | 120 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/03/1950 | 26/04/1950 | 44 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61720 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1951 | 03/1951 | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 24/12/1951 | 01/02/1952 | 40 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/04/1954 | 14/05/1954 | 43 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/05/1954 | 15/05/1954 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/09/1955 | 29/10/1955 | 52 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
08/10/1955 | North Eastern Miscellany | Class B16 engines have now appeared at sheds in the Newcastle-upon-Tyne area and the following have been noted working between Heaton and Berwick on various classes of trains: 61410/13/14/15/40/67/69. Class K2 2-6-0 locos noted en route between Newcastle and Cowlairs recently for overhaul and repainting have been Nos. 61720/27/62/65. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101 worked a Newcastle-Berwick passenger train on the 21st Sept. en route for the Scottish Region. Class J21 0-6-0 Nos. 65117 an 65070 were hauled dead by a Class J39 for the north on 4/10 and a class Dll 4-4-0 62684 hauled Class K1 62031 dead from Haymarket shed to Gateshead on October 5th. During mid-October, Class D49 4-4-0 Nos. 62752 an 62720 have been observed working a morning Sunderland-Newcastle slow passenger train as a running-in turn, both engines being recently ex-works. | SLS/195512 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1630 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1354 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) |
||
06/07/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1922. Dep: 11/11/1922. | ||
16/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/04/1923. Dep: 21/04/1923. Work undertaken: New chimney to G E gauge |
||
05/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1923. Dep: 15/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4630 |
||
05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
30/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
25/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1926. Dep: 29/01/1927. | ||
11/06/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
30/09/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
19/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 16/11/1929. | ||
30/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
27/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1932. Dep: 15/10/1932. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to K2 |
||
09/11/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
04/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1934. Dep: 08/09/1934. | ||
07/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
25/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936. | ||
22/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1938. Dep: 05/02/1938. | ||
16/05/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
23/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1939. Dep: 27/01/1940. | ||
02/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1943. Dep: 30/01/1943. | ||
17/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
02/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1945. Dep: 07/05/1945. | ||
16/04/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1720 | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
07/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1947. Dep: 03/09/1947. | ||
14/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1950. Dep: 26/04/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61720 |
||
1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/1951. Dep: ?/03/1951. | ||
24/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1951. Dep: 01/02/1952. | ||
02/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1954. Dep: 14/05/1954. | ||
09/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1954. Dep: 15/05/1954. | ||
10/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
08/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/09/1955. Dep: 29/10/1955. | ||
12/06/1956 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61720 from Boston (40F) | ||
1957 | Scrapped | Scrapped |