|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1922 | 17/02/1923 | 124 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1923 | 14/04/1923 | 12 days | Light Repair | New chimney to G E gauge |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1925 | 10/10/1925 | 130 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4639 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1927 | 14/01/1928 | 86 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1929 | 16/11/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1931 | 11/07/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1933 | 16/12/1933 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1935 | 07/12/1935 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to K2 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1937 | 04/12/1937 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1940 | 30/03/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1942 | 12/12/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/03/1944 | 29/04/1944 | 53 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/03/1945 | 14/04/1945 | 34 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/01/1946 | 1 day | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 15/01/1947 | 22/02/1947 | 39 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/06/1947 | 1 day | Unclassified | Spark arrestor fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 20/11/1947 | 05/12/1947 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/03/1948 | 23/04/1948 | 34 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/10/1948 | 06/10/1948 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/07/1949 | 01/10/1949 | 73 days | General | Alteration to cab side window Renumbered to BR 61729 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/02/1952 | 29/03/1952 | 57 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/03/1953 | 10/04/1953 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/09/1954 | 25/10/1954 | 42 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/11/1954 | 04/12/1954 | 14 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1945 | G.N. Section | K1 3445 is working from New England, and K2 4639 has moved to Scotland in replacement of her. The name 'Mac Cailin Mor' must have, caused some mystification on the G.N.! | SLS/194602 |
27/08/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. | SLS/194910 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1639 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1380 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) |
||
17/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1922. Dep: 17/02/1923. | ||
03/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1923. Dep: 14/04/1923. Work undertaken: New chimney to G E gauge |
||
09/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
03/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1925. Dep: 10/10/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4639 |
||
15/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1927. Dep: 14/01/1928. | ||
28/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1929. Dep: 16/11/1929. | ||
04/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
09/10/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
31/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
06/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 11/07/1931. | ||
14/07/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
17/08/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
14/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
04/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933. | ||
09/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1935. Dep: 07/12/1935. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to K2 |
||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
27/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
10/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
13/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1937. Dep: 04/12/1937. | ||
29/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
02/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940. | ||
31/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1942. Dep: 12/12/1942. | ||
08/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944. | ||
12/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/03/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945. | ||
14/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
16/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/01/1946. | ||
29/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1729 | ||
15/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1947. Dep: 22/02/1947. | ||
28/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/06/1947. Work undertaken: Spark arrestor fitted |
||
20/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1947. Dep: 05/12/1947. | ||
14/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (PKD) | ||
21/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 21/03/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948. | ||
05/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/10/1948. Dep: 06/10/1948. | ||
21/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1949. Dep: 01/10/1949. Work undertaken: Alteration to cab side window Renumbered to BR 61729 |
||
13/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
19/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
21/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
02/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1952. Dep: 29/03/1952. | ||
24/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1953. Dep: 10/04/1953. | ||
14/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1954. Dep: 25/10/1954. | ||
21/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/11/1954. Dep: 04/12/1954. | ||
1957 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
25/06/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61729 from Colwick (38A) |