|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1921 | 05/11/1921 | 23 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1923 | 11/06/1923 | 112 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1925 | 25/04/1925 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4641 |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1927 | 16/08/1927 | 97 days | General | Boiler number 7459 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1929 | 25/01/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7257 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1932 | 06/08/1932 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/06/1934 | 11/08/1934 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1936 | 09/05/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 21134 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1938 | 29/01/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 21148 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1939 | 27/01/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1940 | 21/12/1940 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1942 | 16/05/1942 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1944 | 11/08/1944 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 21157 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/11/1945 | 02/02/1946 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 21123 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1946 | 16/11/1946 | 136 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/12/1947 | 18/12/1947 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/01/1948 | 31/01/1948 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 8760 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/06/1950 | 06/08/1950 | 61 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61731 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/09/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 21173 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/01/1956 | 13/02/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 21117 (Diagram 3) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1641 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1426 Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
14/10/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1921. Dep: 05/11/1921. | ||
20/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1923. Dep: 11/06/1923. | ||
12/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
07/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1925. Dep: 25/04/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4641 |
||
12/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1927. Dep: 16/08/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7459 (Diagram 3) |
||
28/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1929. Dep: 25/01/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7257 (Diagram 3) |
||
04/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 06/08/1932. | ||
23/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1934. Dep: 11/08/1934. | ||
18/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21134 (Diagram 3) |
||
08/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21148 (Diagram 3) |
||
30/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1939. Dep: 27/01/1940. | ||
23/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/11/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940. | ||
18/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1942. Dep: 16/05/1942. | ||
05/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1944. Dep: 11/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21157 (Diagram 3) |
||
23/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1945. Dep: 02/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21123 (Diagram 3) |
||
02/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
04/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1946. Dep: 16/11/1946. | ||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1731 | ||
07/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1947. Dep: 18/12/1947. | ||
04/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1948. Dep: 31/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8760 (Diagram 3) |
||
07/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/06/1950. Dep: 06/08/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61731 |
||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
01/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21173 (Diagram 3) |
||
12/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1956. Dep: 13/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21117 (Diagram 3) |
||
22/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61731 from Boston (40F) | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |