|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1922 | 20/05/1922 | 117 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1924 | 18/10/1924 | 89 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4642 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/06/1925 | 11/08/1925 | 51 days | Heavy | Boiler number 7259 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1925 | 05/12/1925 | 48 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/08/1926 | 09/10/1926 | 68 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1927 | 30/04/1927 | 81 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1929 | 18/05/1929 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 7458 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1929 | 19/08/1929 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1931 | 25/04/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1933 | 10/06/1933 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1935 | 27/07/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21123 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1937 | 05/06/1937 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1939 | 11/03/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1940 | 18/01/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1943 | 08/05/1943 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21150 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/10/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 7686 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/04/1947 | 27/09/1947 | 168 days | General | Boiler number 21131 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/06/1949 | 25/08/1949 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 21l52 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61732 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/09/1949 | 01/10/1949 | 7 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/10/1949 | 13/10/1949 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/12/1951 | 17/03/1952 | 82 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/03/1952 | 25/03/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1953 | 05/12/1953 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/06/1954 | 16/07/1954 | 40 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/09/1955 | 22/10/1955 | 52 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/02/1957 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
07/09/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. | SLS/194711 |
09/07/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1642 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1428 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
24/01/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1922. Dep: 20/05/1922. | ||
22/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1924. Dep: 18/10/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4642 |
||
22/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/06/1925. Dep: 11/08/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7259 (Diagram 3) |
||
19/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1925. Dep: 05/12/1925. | ||
03/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/08/1926. Dep: 09/10/1926. | ||
09/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1927. Dep: 30/04/1927. | ||
23/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1929. Dep: 18/05/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7458 (Diagram 3) |
||
20/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1929. Dep: 19/08/1929. | ||
21/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1931. Dep: 25/04/1931. | ||
29/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1933. Dep: 10/06/1933. | ||
29/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21123 (Diagram 3) |
||
01/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1937. Dep: 05/06/1937. | ||
04/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939. | ||
14/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1940. Dep: 18/01/1941. | ||
10/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21150 (Diagram 3) |
||
01/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7686 (Diagram 3) |
||
30/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
19/08/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
02/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
13/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1732 | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
13/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21131 (Diagram 3) |
||
04/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
10/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
22/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
28/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1949. Dep: 25/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21l52 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61732 |
||
25/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/09/1949. Dep: 01/10/1949. | ||
09/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/10/1949. Dep: 13/10/1949. | ||
27/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1951. Dep: 17/03/1952. | ||
24/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/03/1952. Dep: 25/03/1952. | ||
11/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/11/1953. Dep: 05/12/1953. | ||
07/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 07/06/1954. Dep: 16/07/1954. | ||
01/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955. | ||
1957 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
22/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/02/1957. | ||
10/04/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61732 from Colwick (38A) |